ID S1208 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 15 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-28 - Recommitted to Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-28 - Recommitted to Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law relating to commercial driver's licenses to revise definitions; to establish provisions relating to commercial learner's permits; to establish provisions relating to application for a commercial learner's permit; and to establish provisions relating to a certain examination.
Title
Amends existing law relating to commercial driver's licenses to revise definitions; to establish provisions relating to commercial learner's permits; to establish provisions relating to application for a commercial learner's permit; and to establish provisions relating to a certain examination.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-28 | Senate | Recommitted to Transportation |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Read third time in full |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2014-01-24 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Transportation |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |
Subjects
Idaho State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legislature.idaho.gov/legislation/2014/S1208.htm |
Text | http://www.legislature.idaho.gov/legislation/2014/S1208.pdf |