ID S1206 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-11 - Session Law Chapter 322 Effective: 04/11/2017 SECTION 13; 07/01/2017 all other SECTIONS
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

HIGHWAYS AND ROADS -- Adds to, amends and repeals existing law to authorize GARVEE bonding to finance highway transportation projects, to provide distribution from the sales tax account for certain transportation projects, and to revise distributions from the strategic initiatives program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adds to, amends and repeals existing law to authorize GARVEE bonding to finance highway transportation projects, to provide distribution from the sales tax account for certain transportation projects, and to revise distributions from the strategic initiatives program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-11HouseSession Law Chapter 322 Effective: 04/11/2017 SECTION 13; 07/01/2017 all other SECTIONS
2017-03-29HouseReported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
2017-03-29SenateReported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
2017-03-29HouseReceived from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
2017-03-29SenateReported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
2017-03-29SenateReturned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
2017-03-28Houseto Senate
2017-03-28HouseTitle apvd
2017-03-28HouseRules Suspended:
2017-03-28HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2017-03-28HouseRead First Time, Referred to Transportation & Defense
2017-03-28HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2017-03-28Senateto House
2017-03-28SenateTitle apvd
2017-03-28SenateRead in full as required) -- PASSED 19-16-0
2017-03-28SenateRules Suspended (2/3 Vote
2017-03-27SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2017-03-27SenateReported Printed; referred to Transportation
2017-03-27SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback