ID S1205 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-10 - Filed in the office of the Secretary of the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-10 - Filed in the office of the Secretary of the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
ADMINISTRATIVE RULES -- Adds to existing law to provide that administrative rules set to expire on July 1, 2019, will continue to be effective until July 1, 2020, to provide that administrative rules approved or extended by the adoption of a concurrent resolution shall be effective until July 1, 2020, or until such time as they expire, to provide that rules rejected by concurrent resolution shall be null, void, and of no force and effect, and to authorize agencies to amend or repeal certain rules pursuant to the Administrative Procedure Act.
Title
Adds to existing law to provide that administrative rules set to expire on July 1, 2019, will continue to be effective until July 1, 2020, to provide that administrative rules approved or extended by the adoption of a concurrent resolution shall be effective until July 1, 2020, or until such time as they expire, to provide that rules rejected by concurrent resolution shall be null, void, and of no force and effect, and to authorize agencies to amend or repeal certain rules pursuant to the Administrative Procedure Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-10 | Senate | Filed in the office of the Secretary of the Senate |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Senate did not Concur in House Amendments |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Referred to 10th Order for possible concurrence |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Returned from House, amended |
2019-04-10 | House | to Senate |
2019-04-10 | House | Title apvd |
2019-04-10 | House | Rules Suspended: |
2019-04-10 | House | Read first time as amended in House; Filed for Second Reading |
2019-04-10 | House | Filed for First Reading |
2019-04-10 | House | Amendments Referred to the JRA for Printing |
2019-04-10 | House | Reported out without recommendation as amended |
2019-04-10 | House | Referred to the Committee of the Whole |
2019-04-04 | House | Retained on General Orders |
2019-04-02 | House | Reported out of Committee, Recommend place on General Orders |
2019-03-27 | House | Read First Time, Referred to State Affairs |
2019-03-27 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2019-03-26 | Senate | to House |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Title apvd |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 35-0-0 |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Judiciary & Rules |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |