ID S1204 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Session Law Chapter 318 Effective: 04/09/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Session Law Chapter 318 Effective: 04/09/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
MEDICAID -- Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding Medicaid eligibility expansion.
Title
Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding Medicaid eligibility expansion.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-09 | Senate | Session Law Chapter 318 Effective: 04/09/2019 |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2019-04-08 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2019-04-05 | Senate | to enrol |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Title apvd |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Read third time as amended in the House -- PASSED 19-16-0 |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Read in full as required) |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Rules Suspended (2/3 Vote |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Read first time as amended in the House, filed for Second Reading |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Reported engrossed, filed for first reading, as amended |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments; referred to engrossment |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Reported out with recommendation not to concur in House amendment; to 10th order |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Referred to Health & Welfare for concurrence recommendation |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Returned from House, amended |
2019-04-04 | House | to Senate |
2019-04-04 | House | Title apvd |
2019-04-04 | House | Rules Suspended: |
2019-04-04 | House | Read first time as amended in House; Filed for Second Reading |
2019-04-04 | House | Filed for First Reading |
2019-04-04 | House | Amendments Referred to the JRA for Printing |
2019-04-04 | House | Reported out without recommendation as amended |
2019-04-04 | House | Referred to the Committee of the Whole |
2019-04-03 | House | Reported out of Committee, Recommend place on General Orders |
2019-04-03 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Health & Welfare |
2019-04-03 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2019-04-02 | Senate | to House |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Title apvd |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Read third time in full as amended -- PASSED 20-15-0 |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Read in full as required) |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Rules Suspended (2/3 Vote |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Read second time as amended, filed for Third reading |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Read first time as amended, filed for Second Reading |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Reported engrossed, filed for first reading, as amended |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Amendments reported printed |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Amendments ordered printed; referred for engrossment |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Reported out without recommendation, as amended |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Placed in the Committee of the Whole |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Referred to 14th Order for amendment |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Health & Welfare |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |