ID S1201 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 14 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-20 - U.C. to be returned to Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 14 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-20 - U.C. to be returned to Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
APPROPRIATIONS -- LIEUTENANT GOVERNOR -- Relates to the appropriation to the Office of the Lieutenant Governor for fiscal year 2022.
Title
Relates to the appropriation to the Office of the Lieutenant Governor for fiscal year 2022.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-20 | House | U.C. to be returned to Appropriations Committee |
2021-04-20 | House | Previously Read in Full |
2021-04-20 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2021-04-19 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2021-04-16 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2021-04-15 | House | Read First Time, Filed for Second Reading |
2021-04-15 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2021-04-14 | Senate | to House |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Title apvd |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 32-3-0 |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Finance |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |