ID S1188 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-14 - Session Law Chapter 228 Effective: 04/14/2021 SECTION 9; 07/01/2021 all other SECTIONS
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-14 - Session Law Chapter 228 Effective: 04/14/2021 SECTION 9; 07/01/2021 all other SECTIONS
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
APPROPRIATIONS -- DEPARTMENT OF ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY -- Relates to the appropriation to the Department of Environmental Quality for fiscal year 2022.
Title
Relates to the appropriation to the Department of Environmental Quality for fiscal year 2022.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-08 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-14 | Senate | Session Law Chapter 228 Effective: 04/14/2021 SECTION 9; 07/01/2021 all other SECTIONS |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2021-04-12 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2021-04-08 | House | to Senate |
2021-04-08 | House | Title apvd |
2021-04-08 | House | Rules Suspended: |
2021-04-07 | House | Read First Time, Filed for Second Reading |
2021-04-07 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2021-04-06 | Senate | to House |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Title apvd |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 33-2-0 -Engelking |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Finance |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |