ID S1188 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-09 - Signed by Governor on 04/09/13 Session Law Chapter 322 Effective: 07/01/13
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-09 - Signed by Governor on 04/09/13 Session Law Chapter 322 Effective: 07/01/13
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates $30,837,600 to the State Board of Education for community colleges for fiscal year 2014; and provides exemptions to budget law limitations.
Title
Appropriates $30,837,600 to the State Board of Education for community colleges for fiscal year 2014; and provides exemptions to budget law limitations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-09 | Senate | Signed by Governor on 04/09/13 Session Law Chapter 322 Effective: 07/01/13 |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Reported delivered to Governor on 03/29/13 |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2013-04-02 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2013-03-29 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2013-03-28 | House | to Senate |
2013-03-28 | House | Title apvd |
2013-03-28 | House | Miller |
2013-03-28 | House | 59-5-6 AYES -- Agidius, Anderson(01), Anderson(31), Anderst, Andrus, Bateman, Batt, Bell, Bolz, Boyle, Burgoyne, Chew, Clow, Collins, Crane, Dayley, DeMordaunt, Eskridge, Gannon, Gestrin, Gibbs, Hancey, Harris, Hartgen, Henderson, Hixon, Holtzclaw, Kauffman, King, Kloc, Loertscher, Luker, Malek, Meline, Mendive, Miller, Monks, Morse, Moyle, Nielsen, Packer, Palmer, Patterson, Pence, Perry, Raybould, Romrell, Rusche, Shepherd, Smith, Stevenson, Trujillo, VanOrden, Vander Woude, Wills, Wood(27), Woodings, Youngblood, Mr. Speaker NAYS -- Barbieri, Barrett, McMillan, Sims, Wood(35) Absent and excused -- Denney, Erpelding, Horman, Ringo, Thompson, Ward-Engelking Floor Sponsor |
2013-03-28 | House | PASSED |
2013-03-28 | House | Rules Suspended: Ayes 65 Nays 0 Abs/Excd 5, read three times |
2013-03-28 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2013-03-27 | House | Read First Time, Filed for Second Reading |
2013-03-27 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2013-03-26 | Senate | to House |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Title apvd |
2013-03-26 | Senate | PASSED -- 33-2-0 |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Read third time in full |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Finance |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |