ID S1184 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-08 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 247 Effective: 07/01/11 Sections 1-4, 7-9 & 12-18; 07/01/12 Sections 5, 6, 10 & 11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-08 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 247 Effective: 07/01/11 Sections 1-4, 7-9 & 12-18; 07/01/12 Sections 5, 6, 10 & 11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals, amends and adds to existing law relating to education to provide provisions relating to public school technology and online courses; to revise provisions relating to the Educational Support Program; to revise provisions relating to staff allowances; to revise provisions relating to the experience and education multiplier; and to revise provisions relating to obligations to PERSI and Social Security.
Title
Repeals, amends and adds to existing law relating to education to provide provisions relating to public school technology and online courses; to revise provisions relating to the Educational Support Program; to revise provisions relating to staff allowances; to revise provisions relating to the experience and education multiplier; and to revise provisions relating to obligations to PERSI and Social Security.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2011-04-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-08 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 247 Effective: 07/01/11 Sections 1-4, 7-9 & 12-18; 07/01/12 Sections 5, 6, 10 & 11 | |
2011-04-05 | Delivered to Governor on 04/05 | |
2011-04-05 | To Governor | |
2011-04-05 | Sp signed | |
2011-04-04 | Pres signed | |
2011-04-04 | Rpt enrol | |
2011-04-04 | To enrol | |
2011-04-01 | to Senate | |
2011-04-01 | Title apvd | |
2011-04-01 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 44-26-0 | |
2011-03-30 | to 3rd rdg | |
2011-03-30 | 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-29 | to 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-29 | rec d/p | |
2011-03-29 | Rpt out | |
2011-03-25 | to Educ | |
2011-03-25 | 1st rdg | |
2011-03-25 | House intro | |
2011-03-24 | to House | |
2011-03-24 | Title apvd | |
2011-03-24 | Goedde | |
2011-03-24 | 20-15-0 AYES -- Bair, Brackett, Fulcher, Goedde, Hammond, Heider, Hill, Lodge, McGee, McKague, McKenzie, Mortimer, Nuxoll, Pearce, Siddoway, Smyser, Tippets, Toryanski, Vick, Winder NAYS -- Andreason, Bilyeu, Bock, Broadsword, Cameron, Corder, Darrington, Davis, Keough, LeFavour, McWilliam(Malepeai), Schmidt, Stegner, Stennett, Werk Absent and excused -- None Floor Sponsor | |
2011-03-24 | PASSED | |
2011-03-24 | Rls susp | |
2011-03-24 | to 3rd rdg | |
2011-03-24 | 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-23 | to 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-23 | rec d/p | |
2011-03-23 | Rpt out | |
2011-03-21 | to Educ | |
2011-03-21 | Rpt prt | |
2011-03-18 | to printing | |
2011-03-18 | 1st rdg | |
2011-03-18 | Senate intro |