ID S1178 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-10 - Signed by Governor on 04/10/15 Session Law Chapter 318 Effective: 07/01/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-10 - Signed by Governor on 04/10/15 Session Law Chapter 318 Effective: 07/01/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
APPROPRIATIONS - SECRETARY OF STATE - Appropriates an additional $2,000,000 to the Secretary of State for fiscal year 2016 for the presidential primary; and transfers $780,000 from the Consolidated Elections Fund to the General Fund.
Title
Appropriates an additional $2,000,000 to the Secretary of State for fiscal year 2016 for the presidential primary; and transfers $780,000 from the Consolidated Elections Fund to the General Fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-06 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-10 | Senate | Signed by Governor on 04/10/15 Session Law Chapter 318 Effective: 07/01/2015 |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Reported delivered to Governor on 04/09/15 |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2015-04-08 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2015-04-06 | House | to Senate |
2015-04-06 | House | Title apvd |
2015-04-06 | House | Monks |
2015-04-06 | House | 51-18-1 AYES -- Anderson, Anderst, Andrus, Barbieri, Batt, Bell, Beyeler, Boyle, Burtenshaw, Chaney, Cheatham, Clow, Collins, Crane, Dayley, DeMordaunt, Dixon, Gestrin, Gibbs, Harris, Hartgen, Hixon, Holtzclaw, Horman, Kauffman, Kerby, Malek, McDonald, McMillan, Mendive, Miller, Monks, Moyle, Nielsen, Packer, Palmer, Perry, Raybould, Redman, Romrell, Shepherd, Sims, Thompson, Troy, Trujillo, VanOrden, Vander Woude, Wills, Wood, Youngblood, Mr. Speaker NAYS -- Chew, Erpelding, Gannon, Jordan, King, Kloc, Loertscher, Luker, McCrostie, Nate, Nye, Pence, Rubel, Rudolph, Rusche, Scott, Smith, Wintrow Absent -- Bateman Floor Sponsor |
2015-04-06 | House | PASSED |
2015-04-06 | House | Rules Suspended: Ayes 69 Nays 0 Abs/Excd 1, read three times |
2015-04-06 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2015-04-02 | House | Read First Time, Filed for Second Reading |
2015-04-02 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2015-04-01 | Senate | to House |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Title apvd |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Keough |
2015-04-01 | Senate | 21-11-3 AYES -- Bair, Bayer, Brackett, Cameron, Davis, Den Hartog, Hagedorn, Heider, Hill, Keough, Lakey, Lodge, Nonini, Nuxoll, Patrick, Rice, Souza, Thayn, Tippets, Vick, Winder NAYS -- Buckner-Webb, Burgoyne, Guthrie, Johnson, Jordan, Lacey, Lee, Martin, Siddoway, Stennett, Ward-Engelking Absent and excused -- McKenzie, Mortimer, Schmidt Floor Sponsor |
2015-04-01 | Senate | PASSED |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Read in full as required) |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Rules Suspended (2/3 Vote |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Finance |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |