ID S1157 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-28 - Session Law Chapter 203 Effective: 07/01/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-28 - Session Law Chapter 203 Effective: 07/01/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
APPROPRIATIONS -- HISTORICAL SOCIETY -- Appropriates $8,056,600 to the Idaho State Historical Society for fiscal year 2018; and limits the number of authorized full-time equivalent positions to 55.
Title
Appropriates $8,056,600 to the Idaho State Historical Society for fiscal year 2018; and limits the number of authorized full-time equivalent positions to 55.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-28 | Senate | Session Law Chapter 203 Effective: 07/01/2017 |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2017-03-22 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2017-03-20 | House | to Senate |
2017-03-20 | House | Title apvd |
2017-03-20 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 49-21-0 |
2017-03-17 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2017-03-16 | House | Read First Time, Filed for Second Reading |
2017-03-16 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2017-03-15 | Senate | to House |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Title apvd |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 31-3-1 |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Finance |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |