ID S1156 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-28 - Bill Previously Held at Desk, Referred to Ways & Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-28 - Bill Previously Held at Desk, Referred to Ways & Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
JUDGES -- Amends existing law to revise a provision regarding the salaries of judges.
Title
Amends existing law to revise a provision regarding the salaries of judges.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-28 | House | Bill Previously Held at Desk, Referred to Ways & Means |
2023-03-16 | House | Read First Time, Held at Desk |
2023-03-16 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2023-03-15 | Senate | to House |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Title apvd |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 23-10-2 |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Judiciary & Rules |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |