ID S1155 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-20 - Signed by Governor on 04/20/15 Session Law Chapter 336 Effective: 07/01/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-20 - Signed by Governor on 04/20/15 Session Law Chapter 336 Effective: 07/01/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
FLAGS - Amends existing law to provide that the Governor, unless prohibited by the United States Flag Code, may direct that the flag of the United States be flown at half-staff at certain monuments, to provide for the duration of the directive and for renewal and to provide that the Governor may request the time, manner and condition of such direction in keeping with the traditions of the United States Flag Code.
Title
Amends existing law to provide that the Governor, unless prohibited by the United States Flag Code, may direct that the flag of the United States be flown at half-staff at certain monuments, to provide for the duration of the directive and for renewal and to provide that the Governor may request the time, manner and condition of such direction in keeping with the traditions of the United States Flag Code.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-20 | Senate | Signed by Governor on 04/20/15 Session Law Chapter 336 Effective: 07/01/2015 |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Reported delivered to Governor on 04/09/15 |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2015-04-08 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2015-04-02 | House | to Senate |
2015-04-02 | House | Title apvd |
2015-04-02 | House | Wood |
2015-04-02 | House | 67-0-3 AYES -- Anderson, Anderst, Andrus, Barbieri, Batt, Bell, Beyeler, Boyle, Burtenshaw, Chaney, Cheatham, Chew(Killen), Clow, Collins, Dayley, DeMordaunt, Dixon, Erpelding, Gannon, Gestrin, Gibbs, Harris, Hartgen, Hixon, Holtzclaw, Horman, Jordan, Kauffman, Kerby, King, Kloc, Loertscher, Luker, Malek, McCrostie, McDonald, McMillan, Mendive, Miller, Monks, Moyle, Nate, Nielsen, Nye, Packer, Palmer, Pence, Perry, Raybould, Redman, Romrell, Rubel, Rudolph, Scott, Shepherd, Sims, Smith, Thompson(Mickelsen), Troy, Trujillo, VanOrden, Vander Woude, Wills, Wintrow, Wood, Youngblood, Mr. Speaker NAYS -- None Absent -- Bateman, Crane, Rusche Floor Sponsor |
2015-04-02 | House | PASSED |
2015-04-02 | House | Rules Suspended: Ayes 67 Nays 0 Abs/Excd 3, read three times |
2015-04-02 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2015-04-01 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2015-03-27 | House | Read First Time, Referred to State Affairs |
2015-03-27 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2015-03-26 | Senate | to House |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Title apvd |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Cameron |
2015-03-26 | Senate | 35-0-0 AYES -- Bair, Bayer, Brackett, Buckner-Webb, Burgoyne, Cameron, Davis, Den Hartog, Guthrie, Hagedorn, Heider, Hill, Johnson, Jordan, Keough, Lacey, Lakey, Lee, Lodge, Martin, McKenzie, Mortimer, Nonini, Nuxoll, Patrick, Rice, Schmidt, Siddoway, Souza, Stennett, Thayn, Tippets, Vick, Ward-Engelking, Winder NAYS -- None Absent and excused -- None Floor Sponsor |
2015-03-26 | Senate | PASSED |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Read in full as required) |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Rules Suspended (2/3 Vote |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to State Affairs |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |