ID S1151 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-01 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 153 Effective: 04/01/11 Sections 1 & 2; 07/01/11 All other sections
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-01 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 153 Effective: 04/01/11 Sections 1 & 2; 07/01/11 All other sections
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates an additional $189,000 to the Division of Human Resources for fiscal year 2011; directs the transfer of moneys to the General Fund; appropriates $1,581,300 to the Division of Human Resources for fiscal year 2012; limits the number of full-time equivalent positions to 13; and directs the payment for training.
Title
Appropriates an additional $189,000 to the Division of Human Resources for fiscal year 2011; directs the transfer of moneys to the General Fund; appropriates $1,581,300 to the Division of Human Resources for fiscal year 2012; limits the number of full-time equivalent positions to 13; and directs the payment for training.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2011-03-23 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-01 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 153 Effective: 04/01/11 Sections 1 & 2; 07/01/11 All other sections | |
2011-03-30 | Delivered to Governor on 03/29 | |
2011-03-29 | To Governor | |
2011-03-28 | Sp signed | |
2011-03-25 | Pres signed | |
2011-03-25 | Rpt enrol | |
2011-03-24 | To enrol | |
2011-03-23 | to Senate | |
2011-03-23 | Title apvd | |
2011-03-23 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 67-3-0 | |
2011-03-15 | to 3rd rdg | |
2011-03-15 | 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-14 | to 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-14 | 1st rdg | |
2011-03-14 | House intro | |
2011-03-11 | to House | |
2011-03-11 | Title apvd | |
2011-03-11 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 34-0-1 | |
2011-03-10 | to 3rd rdg | |
2011-03-10 | 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-09 | to 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-09 | rec d/p | |
2011-03-09 | Rpt out | |
2011-03-09 | to Fin | |
2011-03-09 | Rpt prt | |
2011-03-08 | to printing | |
2011-03-08 | 1st rdg | |
2011-03-08 | Senate intro |