ID S1145 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-03 - Signed by Governor on 04/03/13 Session Law Chapter 254 Effective: 07/01/13
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-03 - Signed by Governor on 04/03/13 Session Law Chapter 254 Effective: 07/01/13
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law relating to worker's compensation to extend a temporary premium tax reduction and to extend certain deduction provisions.
Title
Amends existing law relating to worker's compensation to extend a temporary premium tax reduction and to extend certain deduction provisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-03 | Senate | Signed by Governor on 04/03/13 Session Law Chapter 254 Effective: 07/01/13 |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Reported delivered to Governor on 03/29/13 |
2013-03-29 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2013-03-29 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2013-03-27 | House | to Senate |
2013-03-27 | House | Title apvd |
2013-03-27 | House | Anderson(31) |
2013-03-27 | House | 69-0-1 AYES -- Agidius, Anderson(01), Anderson(31), Anderst, Andrus, Barbieri, Barrett, Bateman, Batt, Bell, Bolz, Boyle, Burgoyne, Chew, Clow, Collins, Crane, Dayley, DeMordaunt, Denney, Erpelding, Eskridge, Gannon, Gestrin, Gibbs, Hancey, Harris, Hartgen, Henderson, Hixon, Horman, Kauffman, King, Kloc, Loertscher, Luker, Malek, McMillan, Meline, Mendive, Miller, Monks, Morse, Moyle, Nielsen, Packer, Palmer, Patterson, Pence, Perry, Raybould, Ringo, Romrell, Rusche, Shepherd, Sims, Smith, Stevenson, Thompson, Trujillo, VanOrden, Vander Woude, Ward-Engelking, Wills, Wood(27), Wood(35), Woodings, Youngblood, Mr. Speaker NAYS -- None Absent and excused -- Holtzclaw Floor Sponsor |
2013-03-27 | House | PASSED |
2013-03-27 | House | Rules Suspended: Ayes 70 Nays 0 Abs/Excd 0, read three times |
2013-03-27 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2013-03-26 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2013-03-21 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Commerce & Human Resources |
2013-03-21 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2013-03-20 | Senate | to House |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Title apvd |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Schmidt |
2013-03-20 | Senate | 35-0-0 AYES -- Bair, Bayer, Bock, Brackett, Buckner-Webb, Cameron, Davis, Durst, Fulcher, Goedde, Guthrie, Hagedorn, Heider, Hill, Johnson, Keough, Lacey, Lakey, Lodge, Martin, McKenzie, Mortimer, Nonini, Nuxoll, Patrick, Pearce, Rice, Schmidt, Siddoway, Stennett, Thayn, Tippets, Vick, Werk, Winder NAYS -- None Absent and excused -- None Floor Sponsor |
2013-03-20 | Senate | PASSED |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Read in full as required) |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Rules Suspended (2/3 Vote |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Commerce & Human Resources |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |