ID S1143 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-31 - to Gen Ord
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-31 - to Gen Ord
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adds to, amends and repeals existing law relating to dogs to provide for alternative means of identification; to provide for the seizure and impoundment of dogs running at large; to provide for liability regarding dogs attacking or killing animals; to provide for defense against dog attacks; to provide for the designation of dangerous dogs and at-risk dogs; to provide for restrictions and requirements; to provide for violations and impoundment; and to provide for the local regulation of certain dogs.
Title
Adds to, amends and repeals existing law relating to dogs to provide for alternative means of identification; to provide for the seizure and impoundment of dogs running at large; to provide for liability regarding dogs attacking or killing animals; to provide for defense against dog attacks; to provide for the designation of dangerous dogs and at-risk dogs; to provide for restrictions and requirements; to provide for violations and impoundment; and to provide for the local regulation of certain dogs.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2011-03-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-31 | to Gen Ord | |
2011-03-31 | Rpt out | |
2011-03-22 | to Agric Aff | |
2011-03-22 | 1st rdg | |
2011-03-22 | House intro | |
2011-03-21 | to House | |
2011-03-21 | Title apvd | |
2011-03-21 | 3rd rdg as amen -- PASSED -- 34-0-1 | |
2011-03-17 | to 3rd rdg as amen | |
2011-03-17 | 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-16 | to 2nd rdg as amen | |
2011-03-16 | 1st rdg | |
2011-03-16 | Rpt engros | |
2011-03-15 | to engros | |
2011-03-15 | Rpt out amen | |
2011-03-11 | to 14th Ord | |
2011-03-11 | Rpt out | |
2011-03-08 | to Agric Aff | |
2011-03-08 | Rpt prt | |
2011-03-07 | to printing | |
2011-03-07 | 1st rdg | |
2011-03-07 | Senate intro |