ID S1142 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Session Law Chapter 193 Effective: 07/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Session Law Chapter 193 Effective: 07/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
APPROPRIATIONS -- ENDOWMENT FUND INVESTMENT BOARD -- Relates to the appropriation to the Endowment Fund Investment Board for fiscal year 2020.
Title
Relates to the appropriation to the Endowment Fund Investment Board for fiscal year 2020.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-21 | Senate | Session Law Chapter 193 Effective: 07/01/2019 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2019-03-19 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2019-03-15 | House | to Senate |
2019-03-15 | House | Title apvd |
2019-03-15 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 66-1-3 |
2019-03-14 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2019-03-14 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2019-03-13 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2019-03-12 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2019-03-11 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2019-03-08 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, March 11, 2019 |
2019-03-07 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2019-03-06 | House | Read First Time, Filed for Second Reading |
2019-03-06 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2019-03-05 | Senate | to House |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Title apvd |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 35-0-0 |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Finance |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |