ID S1142 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-22 - Signed by Governor on 03/22/13 Session Law Chapter 164 Effective: 07/01/13
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-22 - Signed by Governor on 03/22/13 Session Law Chapter 164 Effective: 07/01/13
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates $4,507,600 to the Commission for the Blind and Visually Impaired for fiscal year 2014; limits the number of full-time equivalent positions to 39.12; and provides guidance for employee compensation.
Title
Appropriates $4,507,600 to the Commission for the Blind and Visually Impaired for fiscal year 2014; limits the number of full-time equivalent positions to 39.12; and provides guidance for employee compensation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-03-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-22 | Senate | Signed by Governor on 03/22/13 Session Law Chapter 164 Effective: 07/01/13 |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Reported delivered to Governor on 03/21/13 |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2013-03-20 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2013-03-18 | House | to Senate |
2013-03-18 | House | Title apvd |
2013-03-18 | House | PASSED -- 65-2-3 |
2013-03-18 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2013-03-15 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, March 18, 2013 |
2013-03-14 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2013-03-13 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2013-03-12 | House | Read First Time, Filed for Second Reading |
2013-03-12 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2013-03-11 | Senate | to House |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Title apvd |
2013-03-11 | Senate | PASSED -- 33-1-1 |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Read third time in full |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Retained on calendar |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Finance |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |