ID S1123 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-23 - Read First Time, Referred to Health & Welfare
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-23 - Read First Time, Referred to Health & Welfare
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
INDIGENT SICK - Amends existing law to revise language for medical assistance for indigent persons.
Title
Amends existing law to revise language for medical assistance for indigent persons.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-23 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Health & Welfare |
2015-03-23 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2015-03-20 | Senate | to House |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Title apvd |
2015-03-20 | Senate | PASSED -- 34-0-1 |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Read third time in full |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Health & Welfare |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |