ID S1118 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-28 - Session Law Chapter 199 Effective: 07/01/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-28 - Session Law Chapter 199 Effective: 07/01/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
FISH AND GAME -- Amends existing law to provide that individuals or landowners that have been issued a kill permit by the director of the Department of Fish and Game or his designee may, in conjunction with their responsibility for field dressing the animals taken, keep one animal for their personal use and to provide that under certain conditions a second animal subsequently taken may be kept by the individual or landowner.
Title
Amends existing law to provide that individuals or landowners that have been issued a kill permit by the director of the Department of Fish and Game or his designee may, in conjunction with their responsibility for field dressing the animals taken, keep one animal for their personal use and to provide that under certain conditions a second animal subsequently taken may be kept by the individual or landowner.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-28 | Senate | Session Law Chapter 199 Effective: 07/01/2017 |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2017-03-22 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2017-03-20 | House | to Senate |
2017-03-20 | House | Title apvd |
2017-03-20 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 67-3-0 |
2017-03-17 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2017-03-16 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2017-03-10 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Resources & Conservation |
2017-03-10 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2017-03-09 | Senate | to House |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Title apvd |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 33-0-2 |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Resources & Environment |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |