ID S1114 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-27 - U.C. to be returned to Health & Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-27 - U.C. to be returned to Health & Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals, amends and adds to existing law relating to behavioral health services.
Title
Repeals, amends and adds to existing law relating to behavioral health services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-27 | House | U.C. to be returned to Health & Welfare Committee |
2013-03-26 | House | Reported out of Committee, Recommend place on General Orders |
2013-03-19 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Health & Welfare |
2013-03-19 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2013-03-15 | Senate | to House |
2013-03-15 | Senate | Title apvd |
2013-03-15 | Senate | PASSED -- 25-10-0 |
2013-03-15 | Senate | Read third time in full as amended |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Retained on calendar |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Read second time as amended, filed for Third reading |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Read first time as amended, filed for Second Reading |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Reported engrossed, filed for first reading, as amended |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Amendments reported printed |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Amendments ordered printed; referred for engrossment |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Reported out without recommendation, as amended |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Placed in the Committee of the Whole |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Referred to 14th Order for amendment |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Retained on calendar |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Health & Welfare |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |