ID S1108 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Returned from House Failed; to Secretary of Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

EDUCATION -- Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding reimbursement to school districts from the driver training account and to provide for certain scholarships and grants.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding reimbursement to school districts from the driver training account and to provide for certain scholarships and grants.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-19 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-19SenateReturned from House Failed; to Secretary of Senate
2019-03-19SenateTransmitted to the Secretary of the Senate
2019-03-19Senatemotion failed
2019-03-19SenateMotion to reconsider
2019-03-19SenateHeld at Desk
2019-03-19SenateNotice to reconsider
2019-03-19HouseOrder ret’d to Senate
2019-03-19HouseRead Third Time in Full -- FAILED 30-38-2
2019-03-18HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2019-03-15HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2019-02-27HouseRead First Time, Referred to Education
2019-02-27HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2019-02-26Senateto House
2019-02-26SenateTitle apvd
2019-02-26SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 31-3-1
2019-02-22SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2019-02-21SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2019-02-12SenateReported Printed; referred to Education
2019-02-11SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback