ID S1108 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-27 - Session Law Chapter 168 Effective: 07/01/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

JUDGES” SALARIES -- Amends existing law to increase the salaries.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to increase the salaries.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 61 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-27SenateSession Law Chapter 168 Effective: 07/01/2017
2017-03-21SenateReported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
2017-03-21HouseReceived from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
2017-03-20SenateReported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
2017-03-17SenateReturned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
2017-03-16Houseto Senate
2017-03-16HouseTitle apvd
2017-03-16HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 61-9-0
2017-03-15HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2017-03-14HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2017-03-13HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2017-03-10HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2017-03-03HouseRead First Time, Referred to Judiciary, Rules & Administration
2017-03-03HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2017-03-02Senateto House
2017-03-02SenateTitle apvd
2017-03-02SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 34-0-1
2017-02-28SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2017-02-27SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2017-02-22SenateReported Printed; referred to Judiciary & Rules
2017-02-21SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback