ID S1100 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-22 - Session Law Chapter 120 Effective: 07/01/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-22 - Session Law Chapter 120 Effective: 07/01/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
EDUCATION -- Adds to existing law to establish privacy and safety standards in public schools.
Title
Adds to existing law to establish privacy and safety standards in public schools.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-22 | Senate | Session Law Chapter 120 Effective: 07/01/2023 |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2023-03-20 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2023-03-17 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2023-03-17 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2023-03-16 | House | to Senate |
2023-03-16 | House | Title apvd |
2023-03-16 | House | Rules Suspended: |
2023-03-16 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2023-03-15 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2023-03-14 | House | Bill Previously Held at Desk, Referred to Education |
2023-03-13 | House | Read First Time, Held at Desk |
2023-03-13 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2023-03-09 | Senate | to House |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Title apvd |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Read third time in full as amended -- PASSED 28-7-0 |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Read second time as amended, filed for Third reading |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Read first time as amended, filed for Second Reading |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Reported engrossed, filed for first reading, as amended |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Amendments reported printed |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Amendments ordered printed; referred for engrossment |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Reported out without recommendation, as amended |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Placed in the Committee of the Whole |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Referred to 14th Order for amendment |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Education |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |