ID S1099 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 13 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-27 - Referred to 14th Order for amendment
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-27 - Referred to 14th Order for amendment
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
PROTECTION OF PUPIL AND PARENTAL RIGHTS ACT -- Adds to existing law to enact the Protection of Pupil and Parental Rights Act.
Title
Adds to existing law to enact the Protection of Pupil and Parental Rights Act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-27 | Senate | Referred to 14th Order for amendment |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Read third time in full as amended |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Retained on calendar |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Retained on calendar |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Read second time as amended, filed for Third reading |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Read first time as amended, filed for Second Reading |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Reported engrossed, filed for first reading, as amended |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Amendments reported printed |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Amendments ordered printed; referred for engrossment |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Reported out without recommendation, as amended |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Placed in the Committee of the Whole |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Referred to 14th Order for amendment |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Retained on calendar |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Education |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |