ID S1098 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-22 - Read First Time, Referred to Health & Welfare
Pending: House Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-22 - Read First Time, Referred to Health & Welfare
Pending: House Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
BONE MARROW DONATION -- Adds to existing law to provide that physicians may inquire if patients are bone marrow donors and offer them information on the bone marrow registry.
Title
Adds to existing law to provide that physicians may inquire if patients are bone marrow donors and offer them information on the bone marrow registry.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-22 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Health & Welfare |
2019-02-22 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2019-02-21 | Senate | to House |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Title apvd |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 34-0-1 |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Health & Welfare |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |