ID S1093 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-06 - Session Law Chapter 274 Effective: 07/01/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-06 - Session Law Chapter 274 Effective: 07/01/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
CRIMINAL OFFENSES -- Amends existing law to revise the penalties for unlawful entry and to provide for restitution.
Title
Amends existing law to revise the penalties for unlawful entry and to provide for restitution.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 63 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 63 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-06 | House | Session Law Chapter 274 Effective: 07/01/2017 |
2017-03-29 | House | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2017-03-28 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2017-03-28 | Senate | to enrol |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Title apvd |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Read in full as required) -- PASSED 27-8-0 |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Rules Suspended (2/3 Vote |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Read first time as amended in the House, filed for Second Reading |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Reported engrossed, filed for first reading, as amended |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments; referred to engrossment |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Referred to 10th Order for possible concurrence |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Returned from House, amended |
2017-03-24 | House | to Senate |
2017-03-24 | House | Title apvd |
2017-03-24 | House | Read third time in full as amended in House -- PASSED 63-4-3 |
2017-03-23 | House | Read second time as amended in House; Filed for Third Reading |
2017-03-22 | House | Read first time as amended in House; Filed for Second Reading |
2017-03-22 | House | Filed for First Reading |
2017-03-22 | House | Amendments Referred to the JRA for Printing |
2017-03-22 | House | Reported out without recommendation as amended |
2017-03-22 | House | Referred to the Committee of the Whole |
2017-03-22 | House | Reported out of Committee, Recommend place on General Orders |
2017-03-08 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Judiciary, Rules & Administration |
2017-03-08 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2017-03-07 | Senate | to House |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Title apvd |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 21-13-1 |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Judiciary & Rules |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |