ID S1082 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 13 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-28 - Recommitted to State Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-28 - Recommitted to State Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
SHERIFFS -- Amends existing law to provide qualifications for sheriff candidates.
Title
Amends existing law to provide qualifications for sheriff candidates.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-28 | Senate | Recommitted to State Affairs |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Read third time in full |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to State Affairs |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |