ID S1079 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-28 - Session Law Chapter 198 Effective: 07/01/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-28 - Session Law Chapter 198 Effective: 07/01/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
LIMITED LINES TRAVEL INSURANCE ACT -- Adds to and amends existing law to provide requirements for limited lines travel insurance producers.
Title
Adds to and amends existing law to provide requirements for limited lines travel insurance producers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-28 | Senate | Session Law Chapter 198 Effective: 07/01/2017 |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2017-03-22 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2017-03-20 | House | to Senate |
2017-03-20 | House | Title apvd |
2017-03-20 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 42-27-1 |
2017-03-17 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2017-03-16 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2017-03-08 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Business |
2017-03-08 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2017-03-07 | Senate | to House |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Title apvd |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 32-2-1 |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Commerce & Human Resources |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |