ID S1071 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-13 - Read First Time, Referred to Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-13 - Read First Time, Referred to Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
EDUCATION -- Amends existing law to prohibit instruction on human sexuality, sexual orientation, or gender identity prior to fifth grade.
Title
Amends existing law to prohibit instruction on human sexuality, sexual orientation, or gender identity prior to fifth grade.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-13 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Education |
2023-03-13 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2023-03-08 | Senate | to House |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Title apvd |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Read third time in full as amended -- PASSED 28-7-0 |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Read second time as amended, filed for Third reading |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Read first time as amended, filed for Second Reading |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Reported engrossed, filed for first reading, as amended |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Amendments reported printed |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Amendments ordered printed; referred for engrossment |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Reported out without recommendation, as amended |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Placed in the Committee of the Whole |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Referred to 14th Order for amendment |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Education |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |