ID S1065 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - Session Law Chapter 307 Effective: 07/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - Session Law Chapter 307 Effective: 07/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
TRANSPORTATION -- Adds to and amends existing law to provide for the issuance of certain bonds and to establish the Transportation Expansion and Congestion Mitigation Program Capital Project Fund and the Transportation Expansion and Congestion Mitigation Program Debt Service Fund.
Title
Adds to and amends existing law to provide for the issuance of certain bonds and to establish the Transportation Expansion and Congestion Mitigation Program Capital Project Fund and the Transportation Expansion and Congestion Mitigation Program Debt Service Fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-04 | Senate | Session Law Chapter 307 Effective: 07/01/2019 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2019-04-03 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2019-04-02 | House | to Senate |
2019-04-02 | House | Title apvd |
2019-04-02 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 37-32-1 |
2019-04-01 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2019-03-29 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, April 1, 2019 |
2019-03-28 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2019-03-27 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2019-02-27 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Transportation & Defense |
2019-02-27 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2019-02-26 | Senate | to House |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Title apvd |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 20-15-0 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Transportation |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |