ID S1064 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-20 - Session Law Chapter 94 Effective: 07/01/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-20 - Session Law Chapter 94 Effective: 07/01/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
IRRIGATION -- Amends existing law to revise fee provisions regarding petitions for exclusion; to revise when hearings are to be held regarding petitions for exclusion, to require payment of outstanding assessments, to provide for liens; to revise provisions regarding exceptions to payment of costs associated with exclusion of land, and to revise when hearings are to be held.
Title
Amends existing law to revise fee provisions regarding petitions for exclusion; to revise when hearings are to be held regarding petitions for exclusion, to require payment of outstanding assessments, to provide for liens; to revise provisions regarding exceptions to payment of costs associated with exclusion of land, and to revise when hearings are to be held.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-09 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 62 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-20 | Senate | Session Law Chapter 94 Effective: 07/01/2017 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2017-03-14 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2017-03-09 | House | to Senate |
2017-03-09 | House | Title apvd |
2017-03-09 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 62-7-1 |
2017-03-08 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2017-03-07 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2017-03-06 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2017-03-03 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2017-03-02 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2017-02-27 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Resources & Conservation |
2017-02-27 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2017-02-24 | Senate | to House |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Title apvd |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 34-0-1 |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Retained on calendar |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Resources & Environment |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |