ID S1060 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-20 - Session Law Chapter 93 Effective: 07/01/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-20 - Session Law Chapter 93 Effective: 07/01/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
HEALTH CARE -- Adds to existing law to provide that the state Department of Health and Welfare shall make available certain information regarding cytomegalovirus.
Title
Adds to existing law to provide that the state Department of Health and Welfare shall make available certain information regarding cytomegalovirus.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-09 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-20 | Senate | Session Law Chapter 93 Effective: 07/01/2017 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2017-03-14 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2017-03-09 | House | to Senate |
2017-03-09 | House | Title apvd |
2017-03-09 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 59-10-1 |
2017-03-08 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2017-03-07 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2017-03-06 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2017-02-28 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Health & Welfare |
2017-02-28 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2017-02-27 | Senate | to House |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Title apvd |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 31-3-1 |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Health & Welfare |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |