ID S1057 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-16 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 70 Effective: 02/15/11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-16 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 70 Effective: 02/15/11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law relating to the control of venereal diseases to provide that certain persons shall be tested for the human immunodeficiency virus and to provide that at the request of certain persons, such test shall be administered not later than forty-eight hours after the date on which the information or indictment is presented.
Title
Amends existing law relating to the control of venereal diseases to provide that certain persons shall be tested for the human immunodeficiency virus and to provide that at the request of certain persons, such test shall be administered not later than forty-eight hours after the date on which the information or indictment is presented.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2011-03-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-02-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-16 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 70 Effective: 02/15/11 | |
2011-03-11 | Delivered to Governor on 03/10 | |
2011-03-10 | To Governor | |
2011-03-09 | Sp signed | |
2011-03-08 | Pres signed | |
2011-03-08 | Rpt enrol | |
2011-03-07 | To enrol | |
2011-03-04 | to Senate | |
2011-03-04 | Title apvd | |
2011-03-04 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 65-0-5 | |
2011-03-01 | to 3rd rdg | |
2011-03-01 | 2nd rdg | |
2011-02-28 | to 2nd rdg | |
2011-02-28 | rec d/p | |
2011-02-28 | Rpt out | |
2011-02-21 | to Jud | |
2011-02-21 | 1st rdg | |
2011-02-21 | House intro | |
2011-02-18 | to House | |
2011-02-18 | Title apvd | |
2011-02-18 | 3rd rdg as amen -- PASSED -- 34-0-1 | |
2011-02-17 | to 3rd rdg as amen | |
2011-02-17 | 2nd rdg | |
2011-02-16 | to 2nd rdg as amen | |
2011-02-16 | 1st rdg | |
2011-02-16 | Rpt engros | |
2011-02-15 | to engros | |
2011-02-15 | Rpt out amen | |
2011-02-11 | To 14th Ord | |
2011-02-10 | 3rd rdg | |
2011-02-09 | to 3rd rdg | |
2011-02-09 | 2nd rdg | |
2011-02-08 | to 2nd rdg | |
2011-02-08 | rec d/p | |
2011-02-08 | Rpt out | |
2011-02-01 | to Jud | |
2011-02-01 | Rpt prt | |
2011-01-31 | to printing | |
2011-01-31 | 1st rdg | |
2011-01-31 | Senate intro |