ID S1053 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-02-24 - Read First Time, Referred to State Affairs
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

CODIFIER'S CORRECTIONS -- Amends existing law to make codifier's corrections.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to make codifier's corrections.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-24HouseRead First Time, Referred to State Affairs
2021-02-24HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2021-02-23Senateto House
2021-02-23SenateTitle apvd
2021-02-23SenateRead third time in full as amended -- PASSED 35-0-0
2021-02-19SenateRead second time as amended, filed for Third reading
2021-02-18SenateRead first time as amended, filed for Second Reading
2021-02-18SenateReported engrossed, filed for first reading, as amended
2021-02-18SenateAmendments reported printed
2021-02-18SenateAmendments ordered printed; referred for engrossment
2021-02-18SenateReported out without recommendation, as amended
2021-02-18SenatePlaced in the Committee of the Whole
2021-02-09SenateReferred to 14th Order for amendment
2021-02-09SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2021-02-04SenateReported Printed; referred to State Affairs
2021-02-03SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback