ID S1053 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 5 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-22 - Recommitted to Health & Welfare
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Adds to existing law relating to public assistance law to require that the state Department of Health and Welfare or its authorized agent issue certain benefits over the course of not less than ten consecutive days within a month.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adds to existing law relating to public assistance law to require that the state Department of Health and Welfare or its authorized agent issue certain benefits over the course of not less than ten consecutive days within a month.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-02-22SenateRecommitted to Health & Welfare
2013-02-20SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2013-02-19SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2013-02-06SenateReported Printed; referred to Health & Welfare
2013-02-05SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback