ID S1051 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 27-4-1)
Status: Passed on March 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-20 - Session Law Chapter 109 Effective: 07/01/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 27-4-1)
Status: Passed on March 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-20 - Session Law Chapter 109 Effective: 07/01/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
OUTFITTERS AND GUIDES -- Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding the liability of outfitters and guides.
Title
Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding the liability of outfitters and guides.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-20 | Senate | Session Law Chapter 109 Effective: 07/01/2023 |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2023-03-16 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2023-03-14 | House | to Senate |
2023-03-14 | House | Title apvd |
2023-03-14 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 70-0-0 |
2023-03-13 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2023-03-09 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2023-03-08 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2023-03-07 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2023-03-03 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Tuesday, March 7, 2023 |
2023-03-02 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2023-03-01 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2023-02-28 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2023-02-23 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Resources & Conservation |
2023-02-23 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2023-02-22 | Senate | to House |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Title apvd |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 32-2-1 |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Judiciary & Rules |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |