ID S1049 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 5 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-05 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 193 Effective: 07/01/11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 5 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-05 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 193 Effective: 07/01/11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law relating to public assistance law to revise terminology and to revise a definition.
Title
Amends existing law relating to public assistance law to revise terminology and to revise a definition.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2011-03-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-05 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 193 Effective: 07/01/11 | |
2011-04-04 | Delivered to Governor on 04/01 | |
2011-04-01 | To Governor | |
2011-03-31 | Sp signed | |
2011-03-30 | Pres signed | |
2011-03-30 | Rpt enrol | |
2011-03-29 | To enrol | |
2011-03-28 | to Senate | |
2011-03-28 | Title apvd | |
2011-03-28 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 70-0-0 | |
2011-03-23 | to 3rd rdg | |
2011-03-23 | 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-22 | to 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-22 | rec d/p | |
2011-03-22 | Rpt out | |
2011-03-15 | Ref'd to Com/HuRes | |
2011-03-15 | Ret'd to Desk for re-referral | |
2011-03-15 | Rpt out | |
2011-02-24 | to Health/Wel | |
2011-02-24 | 1st rdg | |
2011-02-24 | House intro | |
2011-02-23 | to House | |
2011-02-23 | Title apvd | |
2011-02-23 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 34-0-1 | |
2011-02-21 | to 3rd rdg | |
2011-02-21 | 2nd rdg | |
2011-02-18 | to 2nd rdg | |
2011-02-18 | rec d/p | |
2011-02-18 | Rpt out | |
2011-01-27 | to Health/Wel | |
2011-01-27 | Rpt prt | |
2011-01-26 | to printing | |
2011-01-26 | 1st rdg | |
2011-01-26 | Senate intro |