ID S1048 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-01 - Read First Time, Referred to State Affairs
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-01 - Read First Time, Referred to State Affairs
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
ELECTIONS -- Amends existing law to provide an exemption from postelection audits for selected ballots.
Title
Amends existing law to provide an exemption from postelection audits for selected ballots.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-01 | House | Read First Time, Referred to State Affairs |
2023-03-01 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2023-02-28 | Senate | to House |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Title apvd |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 35-0-0 |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to State Affairs |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |