ID S1043 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-24 - Session Law Chapter 111 Effective: 03/24/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-24 - Session Law Chapter 111 Effective: 03/24/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
MOTOR VEHICLES -- Amends existing law to revise certain exceptions to widths of vehicles.
Title
Amends existing law to revise certain exceptions to widths of vehicles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-24 | Senate | Session Law Chapter 111 Effective: 03/24/2017 |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2017-03-17 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2017-03-15 | Senate | to enrol |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Title apvd |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Read third time as amended in the House -- PASSED 32-2-1 |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Read second time as amended in the House, filed for Third Reading |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Read first time as amended in the House, filed for Second Reading |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Reported engrossed, filed for first reading, as amended |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments; referred to engrossment |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Referred to 10th Order for possible concurrence |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Returned from House, amended |
2017-03-09 | House | to Senate |
2017-03-09 | House | Title apvd |
2017-03-09 | House | Read third time in full as amended in House -- PASSED 66-3-1 |
2017-03-08 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2017-03-07 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2017-03-06 | House | Read second time as amended in House; Filed for Third Reading |
2017-03-03 | House | Read first time as amended in House; Filed for Second Reading |
2017-03-02 | House | Filed for First Reading |
2017-03-02 | House | Amendments Referred to the JRA for Printing |
2017-03-02 | House | Reported out without recommendation as amended |
2017-03-02 | House | Referred to the Committee of the Whole |
2017-03-01 | House | Reported out of Committee, Recommend place on General Orders |
2017-02-16 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Transportation & Defense |
2017-02-16 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2017-02-15 | Senate | to House |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Title apvd |
2017-02-15 | Senate | PASSED 30-4-1 |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Retained on calendar |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Read third time in full |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Retained on calendar |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Transportation |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |