ID S1043 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 31 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-31 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 149 Effective: 07/01/11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 31 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-31 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 149 Effective: 07/01/11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals existing law relating to domestic relations regarding reciprocal duties of support; and regarding the responsibility of relatives to participate in the cost of nursing home care.
Title
Repeals existing law relating to domestic relations regarding reciprocal duties of support; and regarding the responsibility of relatives to participate in the cost of nursing home care.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2011-03-23 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-02-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-31 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 149 Effective: 07/01/11 | |
2011-03-30 | Delivered to Governor on 03/29 | |
2011-03-29 | To Governor | |
2011-03-28 | Sp signed | |
2011-03-25 | Pres signed | |
2011-03-25 | Rpt enrol | |
2011-03-24 | To enrol | |
2011-03-23 | to Senate | |
2011-03-23 | Title apvd | |
2011-03-23 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 66-1-3 | |
2011-03-18 | to 3rd rdg | |
2011-03-18 | 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-17 | to 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-17 | rec d/p | |
2011-03-17 | Rpt out | |
2011-02-14 | to Jud | |
2011-02-14 | 1st rdg | |
2011-02-14 | House intro | |
2011-02-11 | to House | |
2011-02-11 | Title apvd | |
2011-02-11 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 33-1-1 | |
2011-02-09 | to 3rd rdg | |
2011-02-09 | 2nd rdg | |
2011-02-08 | to 2nd rdg | |
2011-02-08 | rec d/p | |
2011-02-08 | Rpt out | |
2011-01-26 | to Jud | |
2011-01-26 | Rpt prt | |
2011-01-25 | to printing | |
2011-01-25 | 1st rdg | |
2011-01-25 | Senate intro |