ID S1042 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-22 - Session Law Chapter 118 Effective: 07/01/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-22 - Session Law Chapter 118 Effective: 07/01/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
EDUCATION -- Amends existing law to exempt certain public charter schools from having to demonstrate strong academic results to qualify for the Public Charter School Facilities Program and to revise a limitation on issuing bonds under the Public Charter School Facilities Program.
Title
Amends existing law to exempt certain public charter schools from having to demonstrate strong academic results to qualify for the Public Charter School Facilities Program and to revise a limitation on issuing bonds under the Public Charter School Facilities Program.
Sponsors
Senate Education Committee | Sen. Tammy Nichols [R] | Rep. Wendy Horman [R] | Sen. Ben Toews [R] |
Sen. Glenneda Zuiderveld [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-22 | Senate | Session Law Chapter 118 Effective: 07/01/2023 |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2023-03-20 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2023-03-17 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2023-03-17 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2023-03-16 | House | to Senate |
2023-03-16 | House | Title apvd |
2023-03-16 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 68-1-1 |
2023-03-15 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2023-03-15 | House | U.C. to place at bottom of third reading calendar one legislative day |
2023-03-14 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2023-03-13 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2023-03-07 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Education |
2023-03-07 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2023-03-06 | Senate | to House |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Title apvd |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Read third time in full as amended -- PASSED 33-0-2 |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Read second time as amended, filed for Third reading |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Read first time as amended, filed for Second Reading |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Reported engrossed, filed for first reading, as amended |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Amendments reported printed |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Amendments ordered printed; referred for engrossment |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Reported out without recommendation, as amended |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Placed in the Committee of the Whole |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Referred to 14th Order for amendment |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Education |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |