ID S1041 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-29 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 141 Effective: 07/01/11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-29 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 141 Effective: 07/01/11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals and adds to existing law relating to the Idaho State Lottery to repeal a code section relating to a temporary line of credit for start-up costs; to remove provisions relating to low-tier claims; and to remove the requirement that all drawings of the State Lottery be witnessed by an independent certified public accountant.
Title
Repeals and adds to existing law relating to the Idaho State Lottery to repeal a code section relating to a temporary line of credit for start-up costs; to remove provisions relating to low-tier claims; and to remove the requirement that all drawings of the State Lottery be witnessed by an independent certified public accountant.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2011-03-23 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-29 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 141 Effective: 07/01/11 | |
2011-03-30 | Delivered to Governor on 03/29 | |
2011-03-29 | To Governor | |
2011-03-28 | Sp signed | |
2011-03-25 | Pres signed | |
2011-03-25 | Rpt enrol | |
2011-03-24 | To enrol | |
2011-03-23 | to Senate | |
2011-03-23 | Title apvd | |
2011-03-23 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 70-0-0 | |
2011-03-17 | to 3rd rdg | |
2011-03-17 | 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-16 | to 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-16 | rec d/p | |
2011-03-16 | Rpt out | |
2011-02-11 | to St Aff | |
2011-02-11 | 1st rdg | |
2011-02-11 | House intro | |
2011-02-10 | to House | |
2011-02-10 | Title apvd | |
2011-02-10 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 33-0-2 | |
2011-02-07 | to 3rd rdg | |
2011-02-07 | 2nd rdg | |
2011-02-04 | to 2nd rdg | |
2011-02-04 | rec d/p | |
2011-02-04 | Rpt out | |
2011-01-25 | to St Aff | |
2011-01-25 | Rpt prt | |
2011-01-24 | to printing | |
2011-01-24 | 1st rdg | |
2011-01-24 | Senate intro |