ID S1039 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-24 - Session Law Chapter 110 Effective: 07/01/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-24 - Session Law Chapter 110 Effective: 07/01/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
EMPLOYMENT SECURITY LAW -- Amends existing law to provide that Idaho Career Information Systems staff in the Department of Labor are classified employees and to provide for a onetime irrevocable election.
Title
Amends existing law to provide that Idaho Career Information Systems staff in the Department of Labor are classified employees and to provide for a onetime irrevocable election.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-24 | Senate | Session Law Chapter 110 Effective: 07/01/2017 |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2017-03-17 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2017-03-15 | House | to Senate |
2017-03-15 | House | Title apvd |
2017-03-15 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 66-2-2 |
2017-03-14 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2017-03-13 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2017-03-10 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2017-03-08 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Commerce & Human Resources |
2017-03-08 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2017-03-07 | Senate | to House |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Title apvd |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Read third time in full as amended -- PASSED 34-0-1 |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Read second time as amended, filed for Third reading |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Read first time as amended, filed for Second Reading |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Amendments reported printed |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Reported engrossed, filed for first reading, as amended |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Amendments ordered printed; referred for engrossment |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Reported out without recommendation, as amended |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Placed in the Committee of the Whole |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Reported out of committee; to 14th Order for amendment |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Commerce & Human Resources |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |