ID S1031 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-14 - Session Law Chapter 18 Effective: 02/14/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

APPROPRIATIONS -- Appropriates and transfers $26,800 from the General Fund to the Hazardous Substance Emergency Response Fund for fiscal year 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriates and transfers $26,800 from the General Fund to the Hazardous Substance Emergency Response Fund for fiscal year 2019.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-08 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-14SenateSession Law Chapter 18 Effective: 02/14/2019
2019-02-13SenateReported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
2019-02-12HouseReceived from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
2019-02-11SenateReported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
2019-02-11SenateReturned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
2019-02-08Houseto Senate
2019-02-08HouseTitle apvd
2019-02-08HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 65-0-5
2019-02-07HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2019-02-06HouseRead First Time, Filed for Second Reading
2019-02-06HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2019-02-05Senateto House
2019-02-05SenateTitle apvd
2019-02-05SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 35-0-0 -Engelking
2019-02-01SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2019-01-31SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2019-01-30SenateReported Printed; referred to Finance
2019-01-29SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback