ID S1031 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-14 - Session Law Chapter 18 Effective: 02/14/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-14 - Session Law Chapter 18 Effective: 02/14/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
APPROPRIATIONS -- Appropriates and transfers $26,800 from the General Fund to the Hazardous Substance Emergency Response Fund for fiscal year 2019.
Title
Appropriates and transfers $26,800 from the General Fund to the Hazardous Substance Emergency Response Fund for fiscal year 2019.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-08 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-14 | Senate | Session Law Chapter 18 Effective: 02/14/2019 |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2019-02-12 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2019-02-08 | House | to Senate |
2019-02-08 | House | Title apvd |
2019-02-08 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 65-0-5 |
2019-02-07 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2019-02-06 | House | Read First Time, Filed for Second Reading |
2019-02-06 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2019-02-05 | Senate | to House |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Title apvd |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 35-0-0 -Engelking |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Finance |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |