ID S1029 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - Returned from House Failed; to Secretary of Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

SCHOOL TURNAROUND ACT -- Adds to existing law to enact the School Turnaround Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adds to existing law to enact the School Turnaround Act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-25SenateReturned from House Failed; to Secretary of Senate
2019-03-22HouseOrder ret’d to Senate
2019-03-22HouseRead Third Time in Full -- FAILED 20-49-1
2019-03-21HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-03-20HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-03-19HouseU.C. to place at bottom of third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-03-18HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2019-03-15HouseReported out of Committee without Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2019-02-18HouseRead First Time, Referred to Education
2019-02-18HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2019-02-15Senateto House
2019-02-15SenateTitle apvd
2019-02-15SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 22-11-2
2019-02-06SenateRetained on calendar
2019-02-04SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2019-02-01SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2019-01-28SenateReported Printed; referred to Education
2019-01-25SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback