ID S1025 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 26 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-03 - Filed in Office of the Secretary of Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-03 - Filed in Office of the Secretary of Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
MARRIAGE -- Amends and repeals existing law to revise certain requirements regarding marriage.
Title
Amends and repeals existing law to revise certain requirements regarding marriage.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-03 | Senate | Filed in Office of the Secretary of Senate |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Read third time in full as amended -- FAILED 16-17-2 |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Read second time as amended, filed for Third reading |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Read first time as amended, filed for Second Reading |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Reported engrossed, filed for first reading, as amended |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Amendments reported printed |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Amendments ordered printed; referred for engrossment |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Reported out without recommendation, as amended |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Placed in the Committee of the Whole |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Reported out of committee; to 14th Order for amendment |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to State Affairs |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |