ID S1017 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-28 - Retained on General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-28 - Retained on General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
FIRE PROTECTION DISTRICTS -- Amends existing law to revise a notice provision for holding an election in a fire protection district.
Title
Amends existing law to revise a notice provision for holding an election in a fire protection district.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-28 | House | Retained on General Orders |
2017-03-22 | House | Retained on General Orders |
2017-03-14 | House | Retained on General Orders |
2017-03-08 | House | Reported out of Committee, Recommend place on General Orders |
2017-02-03 | House | Read First Time, Referred to State Affairs |
2017-02-03 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2017-02-02 | Senate | to House |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Title apvd |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 34-0-1 |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Local Government & Taxation |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |