ID S1016 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-27 - Session Law Chapter 144 Effective: 07/01/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-27 - Session Law Chapter 144 Effective: 07/01/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
GOVERNMENT -- Amends existing law to provide that a public works contractor shall not be required to provide access to a multiple-occupancy restroom, multiple-occupancy shower facility, or multiple-occupancy changing room on any basis other than sex.
Title
Amends existing law to provide that a public works contractor shall not be required to provide access to a multiple-occupancy restroom, multiple-occupancy shower facility, or multiple-occupancy changing room on any basis other than sex.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-27 | Senate | Session Law Chapter 144 Effective: 07/01/2023 |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2023-03-20 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2023-03-17 | Senate | to enrol |
2023-03-17 | Senate | Title apvd |
2023-03-17 | Senate | Read third time as amended in the House -- PASSED 27-7-1 |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Read second time as amended in the House, filed for Third Reading |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Read first time as amended in the House, filed for Second Reading |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Reported engrossed, filed for first reading, as amended |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments; referred to engrossment |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Referred to 10th Order for possible concurrence |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Returned from House, amended |
2023-03-13 | House | to Senate |
2023-03-13 | House | Title apvd |
2023-03-13 | House | Read third time in full as amended in House -- PASSED 56-10-4 |
2023-03-09 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2023-03-08 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2023-03-07 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2023-03-03 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Tuesday, March 7, 2023 |
2023-03-02 | House | Read second time as amended in House; Filed for Third Reading |
2023-03-01 | House | Read first time as amended in House; Filed for Second Reading |
2023-02-28 | House | Filed for First Reading |
2023-02-28 | House | Amendments Referred to the JRA for Printing |
2023-02-28 | House | Reported out without recommendation as amended |
2023-02-28 | House | Referred to the Committee of the Whole |
2023-02-21 | House | Reported out of Committee, Recommend place on General Orders |
2023-02-09 | House | Read First Time, Referred to State Affairs |
2023-02-09 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2023-02-08 | Senate | to House |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Title apvd |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 28-7-0 |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to State Affairs |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |