ID S1008 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-20 - Session Law Chapter 86 Effective: 07/01/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-20 - Session Law Chapter 86 Effective: 07/01/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
SURVEYS -- Amends existing law to revise the definition of “basis of bearing.”
Title
Amends existing law to revise the definition of “basis of bearing.”
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-09 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-20 | Senate | Session Law Chapter 86 Effective: 07/01/2017 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2017-03-14 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2017-03-09 | House | to Senate |
2017-03-09 | House | Title apvd |
2017-03-09 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 68-1-1 |
2017-03-08 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2017-03-07 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2017-03-06 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2017-03-03 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2017-03-02 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2017-02-22 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Business |
2017-02-22 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2017-02-21 | Senate | to House |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Title apvd |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 35-0-0 |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Commerce & Human Resources |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |